Theal, Michael Donald (CPSO#: 69924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Cardiology Services
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 576-3099
Fax: (519) 576-3112
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Theal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2015


Corporation Name: Theal Didyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Theal ( CPSO# 69924 )
Dr. N. Didyk ( CPSO# 70028 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6425

Business Address:
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 208
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-3099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DONALD THEAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004