Theis, Jochen Goar Walther (CPSO#: 67619)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1996