Theng, Pei Shih (CPSO#: 86169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone: (519) 426-4821
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Pei  Shih  Theng  may  practice medicine independently in Family Medicine,
            only.