Thenganatt, Lilly (CPSO#: 62989)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Malayalam

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Thorncliffe Medical Center Suite A6 45 Overlea Blvd Toronto, ON M4H 1C3 416-696-9836
Date Received: 08 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017