Theobald, Geoffrey Mann (CPSO#: 18837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3910 Bathurst St Suite206
Medvisit Doctors Housecall Service
Downsview ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone: 4166310298
Fax: 4166310613
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey M. Theobald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Theobald ( CPSO# 18837 )

Business Address:
Medvisit Doctors Houseacall Emergemcy
3910 Bathurst Street
Site 206
Downsview ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone Number: (416) 631-0298

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEOFFREY MANN THEOBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THEOBALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Dec 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1969