Theriault, Claudine Marie Ange Noella (CPSO#: 54687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 05 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Aug 1987