Theriault, Cynthia Hsueh-Ying (CPSO#: 77734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
River Valley Health
Department of Radiology DECH
P O Box 9000
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton NB  E3B 5N5
Phone: (506) 452-5136

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA HSUEH-YING THERIAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THERIAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007