Theriault, Diane Marie Yvonne (CPSO#: 58238)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1989