Therrien, Arawn Alexandra Adrienne (CPSO#: 76022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Mill Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2L5
Phone: (613) 382-3974
Fax: (613) 382-4417
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arawn Therrien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Therrien ( CPSO# 76022 )

Business Address:
25 Mill Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2L5
Phone Number: (613) 382-2680

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARAWN ALEXANDRA ADRIENNE THERRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THERRIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004