Theune, Shannon Elizabeth Lois (CPSO#: 109844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON ELIZABETH LOIS THEUNE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. THEUNE is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. THEUNE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. THEUNE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. THEUNE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. THEUNE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. THEUNE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018