Thibault, Joseph Hubert Armand (CPSO#: 13890)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1996