Thibert, Jean-Francois (CPSO#: 80473)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2004 to 07 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2012