Thibert, Robert Francis (CPSO#: 55542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Thibert can be contacted at (226) 234-8928 or dr.thibert.records@gmail.com for medical records requests.
Date Received: 18 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANCIS THIBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIBERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1990