Thiboutot, Francois (CPSO#: 87255)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUQ Hotel Dieu de Quebec
11 Cote du Palais
Quebec QC  G1R 2J6
Phone: (418) 525-4444

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS THIBOUTOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIBOUTOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007