Thien, Vincent Vun Su (CPSO#: 73864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hakka

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 335-7001
Fax: (416) 335-4672
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1635 lawrence ave w, unit #201
north york, on
Toronto ON  M3K 1E7
Canada
Phone: 416-630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

north scarborough endo clinic
105 - 4040 finch ave e
Scarborough ON  M1S4V5
Canada
Phone: 416-293-9402
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Thien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Thien ( CPSO# 73864 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 335-7001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 11 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT VUN SU THIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003