Thiessen, Elfrieda Erika (CPSO#: 59551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Herzog-Adolph-Strasse 5
Koenigstein 61462
Germany
Phone: +4961742496286

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELFRIEDA ERIKA THIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIESSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990