Thijssen, Anthony Mathias (CPSO#: 57562)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 09 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2005