Thinakaran, Shayamala (CPSO#: 102143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Ross University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Center
2025 Midland Avenue Unit 100
Toronto ON  M1P 3E4
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Shayamala Thinakaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thinakaran ( CPSO# 102143)

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
Unit 100
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3E4
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAYAMALA THINAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THINAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2014