Thind, Harpreet Kaur (CPSO#: 93126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Wellness Centre
McMaster University
MUSC B101-1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 27700
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARPREET KAUR THIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012