Thiruganasambandamoorthy, Venkatesh (CPSO#: 76347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Clinical Epidemiology Program F6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Fax: (613) 761-5351
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thiruganasambandamoorthy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Thiruganasambandamoorthy ( CPSO# 76347 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Clinical Epidemiology Program F6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VENKATESH THIRUGANASAMBANDAMOORTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUGANASAMBANDAMOORTHY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jul 2001
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2001 to 27 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002