Thirugnanam, Subarna (CPSO#: 82990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 9054727000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thirugnanam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thirugnanam ( CPSO# 82990 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (647) 204-5921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBARNA THIRUGNANAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THIRUGNANAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009