Thistlewood, John Michael (CPSO#: 21529)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000