Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Thomas, Andrew James (CPSO#: 65785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
108 Waltham Road, Unit D, Box 262
Brockville ON  K6V 5V5
Phone: (613) 498-0036
Fax: (613) 498-2495
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thomas ( CPSO# 65785 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992