Thomas, Anthony Dorrien (CPSO#: 28057)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 4 54 Auburn Street Peterborough, ON K9H 2G2
Date Received: 21 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Feb 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016