Thomas, Hana Susan (CPSO#: 104121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: 7056588480
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hana Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Thomas ( CPSO# 104121)

Business Address:
University of Toronto
602 - 500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANA SUSAN THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016