Thomas, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 72843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 208457
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab Hospit
150 Kilgour Rd
Toronto ON  M4G1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005