Thomas, Kenneth Norman (CPSO#: 51940)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002