Thomas, Laura (CPSO#: 101192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Voicu, Laura (used until: 24 Jun 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Medical
324 Prince Edward Drive S, Unit #2
M8Y 3Z5
Toronto ON  M8Y 3Z5
Phone: 6473453048
Fax: 6473453058
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 York St., Suite #4
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Canada
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rosedale Medical Centre
600 Sherbourne St, Unit 212
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 546-3487
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015