Thomas, Niranjan Abraham William (CPSO#: 83936)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 06 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006