Thomas, Tomy V (CPSO#: 102256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family Health Tea
2741 Chamberland St
Rockland
Ottawa ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMY V THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2015