Thomas, Wendy Marie (CPSO#: 87914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Turnbull Medical Building
170 Simcoe St. Suite 202
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 872-4353
Fax: (705) 872-4357
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Thomas ( CPSO# 87914 )

Business Address:
Turnbull Medical Building
Suite 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 872-4353

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY MARIE THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009