Thompson, Aaron Michael Scholfield (CPSO#: 79355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Occupational Health Clinic
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3237
Fax: (416) 864-5421
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thompson ( CPSO# 79355 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Occupational Health Services
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (647) 885-3569

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL SCHOLFIELD THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009