Thompson, Alan Aubrey (CPSO#: 51942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-6760
Fax: (705) 743-9912
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thompson ( CPSO# 51942 )

Business Address:
202 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-6760

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN AUBREY THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984