Thompson, Andrew Eden (CPSO#: 72355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
the arva clinic
14351 Medway Rd
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone: (519) 434-5007
Fax: (519) 672-5007
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew E. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thompson ( CPSO# 72355 )

Business Address:
The Arva Clinic
14351 Medway Road
Arva ON  N0M 1C0
Phone Number: (519) 434-5007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EDEN THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2004