Thompson, Charles Andrew (CPSO#: 71115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Thompson, Andrew Charles (used until: 28 Nov 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Andrew Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson ( CPSO# 71115 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Suite E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ANDREW THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002