Thompson, Diana Patricia Gaye (CPSO#: 81375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
unit 4
Mississauga ON  L5C 3G1
Phone: (905) 848-8686
Fax: (905) 848-8796
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 81375 )

Business Address:
New Best Care Medical Centre
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 4
Mississauga ON  L5C 3G1
Phone Number: (905) 848-8686

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA PATRICIA GAYE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006