Thompson, Guy William St. Maur (CPSO#: 55543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B3-416
Division of Infectious Diseases,
268 Grosvenor Street
London
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519)6633849
Fax: (519) 646-6197
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C4P4
Canada
Phone: 5194329468
Fax: 5194326266
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.W.S. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Thompson ( CPSO# 55543 )

Business Address:
Division of Infectious Diseases
Room B3-416
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P4
Phone Number: (519) 432-9468

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY WILLIAM ST. MAUR THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009