Thompson, Ian Bruce (CPSO#: 65571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Jubilee Hospital
1952 Bay Street
Victoria BC  V8R 1J8
Phone: 250-519-7700 Ext. 18784
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN BRUCE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993