Thompson, John (CPSO#: 24007)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004