Thompson, Judith Anne (CPSO#: 65319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre, FMC
Family Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sistering Clinic,
for Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St E, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M3H 1L6
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judy Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thompson ( CPSO# 65319 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6860

Business Address:
Sistering Clinic
2nd Floor
59 Adelaide Street East
Toronto ON  M3H 1L6
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993