Thompson, Kay An-Whay (CPSO#: 64149)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2007