Thompson, Keith Alexander (CPSO#: 58164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
1135 Adelaide Street
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone: (519) 660-1220
Fax: (519) 660-8739
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Thompson ( CPSO# 58164 )

Business Address:
Suite 213
1135 Adelaide Street
London ON  N5Y 5K7
Phone Number: (519) 660-1220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH ALEXANDER THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988