Thompson, Margaret Anne (CPSO#: 51945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue, Ste 2426
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8870
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ER, St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thompson ( CPSO# 51945 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Emergency Room
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5094

Business Address:
Ontario Poison Centre
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1985