Thompson, Marian Phyllis (CPSO#: 33392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Victoria Road South
Guelph ON  N1E 5R1
Phone: (519) 824-0733
Fax: (519) 824-1348
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marian Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thompson ( CPSO# 33392 )

Business Address:
220 Victoria Road South
Guelph ON  N1E 5R1
Phone Number: (519) 824-0733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIAN PHYLLIS THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1982