Thompson, Michael George Gaius (CPSO#: 22370)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 Feb 1993

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 1991
Summary:

 In October 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Thompson guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Thompson's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Feb 1993
Hearing Date(s): 06 May 1991

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Michael THOMPSON stands charged that:

sometime between and including September 1, 1970 and July 14, 1971, in the Municipality of Metropolitan Toronto, did indecently assault XX, a female person, contrary to Section 141 (1) of the Criminal Code; and

sometime between and including September 1, 1970 and December 31, 1974, in the Municipality of Metropolitan Toronto, did indecently assault XX, a female person, contrary to Section 149(1) of the Criminal Code.

Date of Arrest: August 24, 2016
Date of indictment: December 11, 2017
Crown Attorney – Toronto Region (Etobicoke)
Place of charge: Toronto, ON