Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Thompson, Penelope Jane (CPSO#: 56996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 James Street South
Suite 302A
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 523-0531
Fax: (905) 523-0871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Thompson ( CPSO# 56996 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 56994 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Unit 2F43
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENELOPE JANE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987