Thompson, Robert James (CPSO#: 43555)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1980 to 15 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009