Thompson, Tamara Karlene (CPSO#: 97170)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 22 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014