Thompson, Teresa Urszula (CPSO#: 66966)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1997