Thompson, William Grant (CPSO#: 17932)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1999